Global Patent Index - EP 0654770 B1

EP 0654770 B1 2000-02-02 - Device for early detection of fires

Title (en)

Device for early detection of fires

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Früherkennung von Bränden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la détection précoce des incendies

Publication

EP 0654770 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94113869 A

Priority

CH 347993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654770A1] The arrangement contains a plurality of detectors which are connected to a central station and of which some are fitted with at least two sensors (1, 2) for monitoring different fire characteristics. One sensor (1) is preferably a thermal sensor and the other sensor (2) is an optical sensor. In addition, the arrangement contains means for processing the signals of the sensors. These means are arranged in a decentralised manner in the detectors and they contain a microcontroller (MCU) for conditioning the sensor signals and for signal processing for the purpose of obtaining danger signals. The danger signals are obtained in a neuronal network (NN). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/00; G08B 29/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 31/00 (2006.01); G08B 17/00 (2006.01); G08B 29/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/16 (2013.01); G08B 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654770 A1 19950524; EP 0654770 B1 20000202; AT 189549 T 20000215; CH 686913 A5 19960731; CN 1052087 C 20000503; CN 1122486 A 19960515; DE 59409119 D1 20000309; DK 0654770 T3 20000717; ES 2144474 T3 20000616; JP H07192189 A 19950728; PT 654770 E 20000731; US 5751209 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140904

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140906

2014-09-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140904

2014-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409119

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2013-06-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130305

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189549 T

- Effective date: 20120905

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-03-13 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130305

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110908

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-04-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110318

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080905

2010-04-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2, DE-80333 MUENCHE

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-04-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-05-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2009-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-11-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-09 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-09-08 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, US

- Effective date: 20080829

2007-09-11 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070911

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG#ALTE LANDSTRASSE 411#8708 MAENNEDORF (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144474 T3

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409119 20000309

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189549 T 20000215

1999-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980421

1996-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951115

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE