Global Patent Index - EP 0654801 B1

EP 0654801 B1 2000-06-07 - Magnetic powder, permanent magnet produced therefrom and process for producing them

Title (en)

Magnetic powder, permanent magnet produced therefrom and process for producing them

Title (de)

Magnetisches Pulver, Dauermagnet und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Poudre magnétique, aimant permanent et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0654801 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94114972 A

Priority

JP 28271793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654801A2] A magnetic powder and a permanent magnet are provided which have magnetic properties enhanced by magnetic interaction. Disclosed are a magnetic powder comprising a mixture of two or more powders including a magnetic powder A (residual magnetic flux density: BrA, coercive force: HcA) and a magnetic powder B (residual magnetic flux density: BrB, coercive force: HcB) of which the residual magnetic flux densities and the coercive forces have the following relationships: BrA>BrB and HcA<HcB, and a bonded magnet or a sintered magnet produced from the magnetic powder, and a method for mixing magnetic powders and a process for producing a magnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/055; H01F 1/03; H01F 1/057; H01F 1/058; H01F 1/059; H01F 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/03 (2006.01); H01F 1/055 (2006.01); H01F 1/058 (2006.01); H01F 1/059 (2006.01); H01F 1/08 (2006.01); H01F 1/09 (2006.01); H01F 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0302 (2013.01); H01F 1/0306 (2013.01); H01F 1/055 (2013.01); H01F 1/0557 (2013.01); H01F 1/0558 (2013.01); H01F 1/058 (2013.01); H01F 1/059 (2013.01); H01F 1/083 (2013.01); H01F 1/09 (2013.01); H01F 1/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654801 A2 19950524; EP 0654801 A3 19950705; EP 0654801 B1 20000607; DE 69424845 D1 20000713; DE 69424845 T2 20001207; TW 294815 B 19970101

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140921

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140923

2014-10-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140921

2014-09-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424845

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130917

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424845 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1997-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970506

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950907

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT