Global Patent Index - EP 0654807 B1

EP 0654807 B1 2000-05-03 - Stacked cam switch

Title (en)

Stacked cam switch

Title (de)

Paketnockenschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à cames étagé

Publication

EP 0654807 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94118342 A

Priority

  • DE 4340088 A
  • DE 4440554 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654807A2] The invention relates to a stacked cam switch, having a baseplate (10) on which at least one cam disc (22, 41), which is coupled to a switching shaft, for in each case one switch element (34, 44) is mounted such that it can rotate, in each case one driver disc (17, 40) being integrally formed between each cam disc (22, 41) and the switching shaft, which driver disc (17, 40) can be coupled in a rotationally fixed manner to the cam disc (22, 41) in different positions. The driver disc (17, 40) is coupled in a positively locking and rotationally fixed manner to the switching shaft so that the rotational movement of the switching shaft is transmitted via the driver disc (17, 40) to the cam disc (22, 41), and by the cam disc (22, 41) to the associated switching element (34, 44). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/623 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654807 A2 19950524; EP 0654807 A3 19970423; EP 0654807 B1 20000503; ES 2147209 T3 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-12-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141121

2014-11-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409320

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031124

2004-09-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-11-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031124

2002-11-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021118

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147209 T3

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409320 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980817

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970613

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEAG SICHERHEITSTECHNIK GMBH

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT