Global Patent Index - EP 0654870 B1

EP 0654870 B1 2000-02-09 - Receptacle mounting means for IC card

Title (en)

Receptacle mounting means for IC card

Title (de)

Haltevorrichtung für IC-Karteverbinder

Title (fr)

Moyens de montage pour connecteur de carte à circuit intégré

Publication

EP 0654870 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94117817 A

Priority

US 15617193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654870A2] A receptacle connector (12) for an IC card (10) is provided for mounting on a surface of a circuit substrate (14). The connector includes a dielectric housing (40) having a forward mating face (42), a rearward terminating face (43), and a plurality of terminal-receiving passages (44)) extending therethrough. A plurality of conductive terminals (16) are received in the passages. Each terminal includes a surface mount tail portion (50) projecting from the rearward terminating face of the housing which includes a contact portion (52) for resiliently engaging an appropriate circuit trace (18) on the substrate. The contact portions are disposed in a generally coplanar elongate array. A mounting arm (46) is provided at each end of the housing for mounting the connector on the surface of the substrate. A pair of generally rectangularly configured mounting pegs (54) projects from a bottom mounting face of each mounting arm. Each pair of pegs "straddles" the elongated array of contact portions and is adapted to provide an interference fit within a corresponding mounting hole (56) in the circuit substrate to hold the connector to the substrate during processing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/18; H01R 12/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/70 (2011.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H01R (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654870 A2 19950524; EP 0654870 A3 19960821; EP 0654870 B1 20000209; DE 69422955 D1 20000316; DE 69422955 T2 20001005; HK 1012786 A1 20001027; JP 3016857 U 19951009; KR 0170025 B1 19990330; MY 131562 A 20070830; SG 52319 A1 19980928; TW 323002 U 19971211

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2001-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-07-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001111

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69422955

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/18 A, 7H 01R 12/20 B

1999-09-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980304

1997-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970123

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL