Global Patent Index - EP 0655378 B1

EP 0655378 B1 2000-02-23 - Apparatus and method for steering the wheel sets of railway vehicles

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for steering the wheel sets of railway vehicles

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren von Radsätzen von Schienenfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour orienter les essieux des véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 0655378 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94118409 A

Priority

AT 240293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0655378A1] In an apparatus for steering wheels (4), in particular wheel sets (1, 1'), of a rail vehicle with a device (6), for example at least one spring, for producing a restoring force counter to the steering lock of the wheels (4) or wheel sets (1,1') occurring when travelling through a bend in the track, in addition an apparatus (7) is provided for producing a counter force which is dependent on the radius of the bend in the track and acts counter to the restoring force. As a result, very good steering behaviour of the wheel sets (1, 1') is easily achieved when going through a bend and as a result a low degree of wear and stable straight-ahead travel with a high limit speed is achieved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/386 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0655378 A1 19950531; EP 0655378 B1 20000223; AT 176204 T 19990215; AT 189883 T 20000315; AT 407140 B 20001227; AT A240293 A 20000515; DE 59407754 D1 19990311; DE 59409154 D1 20000330; EP 0765791 A1 19970402; EP 0765791 B1 19990127; ES 2144479 T3 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101123

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409154

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409154

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071123

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2002-05-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INTEGRAL VERKEHRSTECHNIK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT -DANN

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144479 T3

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. BETTELLO LUIGI

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409154 20000330

2000-03-01 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189883 T 20000315

2000-02-23 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 96119274.7 EINGEREICHT AM 02/12/96.

1998-09-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTEGRAL VERKEHRSTECHNIK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1996-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960718

1995-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JENBACHER ENERGIESYSTEME AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1995-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950811

1995-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI