Global Patent Index - EP 0655413 B1

EP 0655413 B1 2000-01-19 - Drivers compartment at lifting trucks

Title (en)

Drivers compartment at lifting trucks

Title (de)

Fahrerkabine für Hebefahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Cabine de conducteur pour chariots élévateur

Publication

EP 0655413 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94850212 A

Priority

SE 9303955 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0655413A1] Device at drivers compartments at lifting trucks including steering wheel (20) for control of travel direction and different control means (21) for controlling the lifting device (13) of the truck. The steering wheel and the control means are arranged on a common control panel (25). This is carried by a movable support arm (26) that is adjustable to different positions for adaption to different drivers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0655413 A1 19950531; EP 0655413 B1 20000119; DE 69422695 D1 20000224; DE 69422695 T2 20010215; SE 507063 C2 19980323; SE 9303955 D0 19931129; SE 9303955 L 19950530

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141127

2014-12-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141127

2014-11-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69422695

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROROGA CONCESSA IN DATA: 09.06.2000;STUDIO TORTA

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69422695 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980319

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951014

1995-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE