Global Patent Index - EP 0655631 B1

EP 0655631 B1 2002-09-04 - Method for manufacturing a color filter and a liquid crystal panel

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a color filter and a liquid crystal panel

Title (de)

Verfahren zu Herstellung eines Farbfilters und eines Flüssigkristallschirms

Title (fr)

procédé de fabrication d'un filtre coloré et d'un écran à cristaux liquides

Publication

EP 0655631 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94118424 A

Priority

JP 29339693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0655631A1] A color filter having shade portions and colored light-transmittable portions on a substrate, said color filter being characterized in that the light-transmittable portions are colored with ink dots, and a difference between a maximum value and a minimum value of light transmittance in a thickness direction in the light-transmittable portions is 20% or less. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 5/20; G02F 1/1335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/20 (2006.01); G02F 1/1335 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/201 (2013.01); G02F 1/133516 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0655631 A1 19950531; EP 0655631 B1 20020904; AT 223578 T 20020915; CN 1081799 C 20020327; CN 1122004 A 19960508; DE 69431283 D1 20021010; DE 69431283 T2 20030109; JP 3332515 B2 20021007; JP H07146406 A 19950606; KR 0173148 B1 19990320; US 5726724 A 19980310

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141122

2014-12-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141122

2014-11-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69431283

2014-11-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69431283

- Representative's name: WESER & KOLLEGEN, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-09-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-11-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-11-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431283 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223578 T 20020915

2001-11-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COLOR FILTER AND A LIQUID CRYSTAL PANEL

2001-10-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COLOR FILTER AND A LIQUID CRYSTAL PANEL

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980225

1996-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951130

1995-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE