Global Patent Index - EP 0655731 B1

EP 0655731 B1 2000-03-29 - Noise suppressor available in pre-processing and/or post-processing of a speech signal

Title (en)

Noise suppressor available in pre-processing and/or post-processing of a speech signal

Title (de)

Rauschunterdrückungseinrichtung zur Vorverarbeitung und/oder Nachbearbeitung von Sprachsignalen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suppression de bruit utilisable dans le prétraitement et/ou traitement ultérieur d'un signal de parole

Publication

EP 0655731 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94118782 A

Priority

JP 29717693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0655731A2] In a noise suppressor capable of suppressing a noise signal before encoding or after decoding, a sequence of speech signals is rendered by the use of an inverse filter or a decoder into a sound source signal corresponding to the speech signal sequence. The noise signal is suppressed from the sound source signal by the use of feature parameters derived from the speech signal sequence. The noise signal can be suppressed within a speech duration and/or a non-speech duration by detecting the speech and the non-speech durations from the feature parameters. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 11/06; G10L 101/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/02 (2006.01); H03H 17/02 (2006.01); H03H 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0655731 A2 19950531; EP 0655731 A3 19970528; EP 0655731 B1 20000329; DE 69423703 D1 20000504; DE 69423703 T2 20000727; JP 2739811 B2 19980415; JP H07152395 A 19950616

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-11 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69423703

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G10L0011060000

- IPC: G10L0021026400

- Effective date: 20141103

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423703

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-11-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69423703

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G10L0011060000

- IPC: G10L0021026400

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423703

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423703 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/06 A, 7G 10L 101/12 B

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980414

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970415

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1995-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL