Global Patent Index - EP 0656050 B2

EP 0656050 B2 2000-03-08 - BUILDER FOR DETERGENTS

Title (en)

BUILDER FOR DETERGENTS

Title (de)

GERÜSTSTOFF FÜR WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

ADJUVANTS POUR AGENTS DE LAVAGE

Publication

EP 0656050 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93919063 A

Priority

  • DE 4228043 A
  • EP 9302172 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4228043A1] Washing and cleaning agents, especially for textiles, which contain combinations of builders like zeolite and/or crystalline laminated silicates of the general formula (I) NaMSixO2x+1.yH2O, in which M is sodium or hydrogen, x is a number from 1.9 to 4 and y is a number from 0 to 20, and, as complex formers, polyhydroxy monocarboxylic acids or polyhydroxy monocarboxylic acid salts with 4 to 6 carbon atoms, possibly a keto group and at least 3 hydroxy groups per molecule, or mixtures of these acids and/or salts, in which the ratio by weight of builders to polyhydroxy monocarboxylic acid or polyhydroxy monocarboxylic salt or mixtures of these acids and/or salts is 30:1 to 1:1, exhibit better secondary washing capacity than similar agents which, instead of polyhydroxy monocarboxylic acids or polyhydroxy monocarboxylic acid salts, contain polyhydroxy tricarboxylic acids or polyhydroxy tricarboxylic acid salts like citric acid or citrate. Preferred agents contain up to 15 wt % sodium and/or potassium carbonate but no phosphonates, (co)polymeric polycarboxylates and citric acid or citrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 11/02 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/02 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4228043 A1 19940303; AT 153055 T 19970515; EP 0656050 A1 19950607; EP 0656050 B1 19970514; EP 0656050 B2 20000308; ES 2102674 T3 19970801; ES 2102674 T5 20000501; JP H08500378 A 19960116; PL 307589 A1 19950529; WO 9404649 A1 19940303

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020817

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-09-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010816

2000-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000830

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000811

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-08-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000807

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-07-03 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2000-06-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-05-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-03-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: JOH. A. BENCKISER GMBH

1998-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1998-04-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JOH. A. BENCKISER GMBH

- Effective date: 19980211

1997-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970831

1997-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970831

1997-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2102674

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1997-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1997-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59306463

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-06-19

1997-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1997-05-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 153055

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1996-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19951201

1995-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950216

1995-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL