Global patent index - EP 0656522 B1

EP 0656522 B1 2000-03-01 - Cartridge case

Title (en)

Cartridge case

Title (de)

Patronenhülse

Title (fr)

Douille pour cartouche

Publication

EP 0656522 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94118834 A

Priority

  • DE 4340998 A
  • DE 4341002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0656522A1] The invention relates to a cartridge case, in particular for firing in small arms, having a base percussion cap chamber (4), which is designed as a cylindrical recess and into whose top at least one detonating channel (11) opens, having a percussion cap which is introduced into the percussion cap chamber (4) (such that it is flush) and has a capsule (6) which is in the form of a pan and consists of a capsule base and a cylindrical side wall, and having a detonating charge (2) and anvil (8) which are arranged in the interior of the capsule (6). In order to improve the gas sealing in the direction in which the weapon is fired, particularly in the case of detonating charges which are free of hazardous materials, it is proposed that the percussion cap chamber (4) be provided in the region of the side wall of the capsule (6) with an expanded region (9), which is circumferential in an annular shape, so that the anvil (8) has space to move outwards after detonation of the detonating charge (2) and expansion of the capsule (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 19/10; F42B 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/36 (2006.01); F42C 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/36 (2013.01); F42C 19/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0656522 A1 19950607; EP 0656522 B1 20000301; AT 190132 T 20000315; US 5481978 A 19960109

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 190132

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141130

2014-12-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409165

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-01 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409165

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT

2000-03-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190132

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970609

1996-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DYNAMIT NOBEL GMBH EXPLOSIVSTOFF- UND SYSTEMTECHNI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951129

1995-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT