EP 0656738 A1 19950607 - Method of manufacturing speakers and speakers made by the method.
Title (en)
Method of manufacturing speakers and speakers made by the method.
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Herstellung von Lautsprechern und nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Lautsprecher.
Title (fr)
Procédé de fabrication de haut-parleurs et haut-parleurs obtenus selon ce procédé.
Publication
Application
Priority
US 16286693 A 19931203
Abstract (en)
A method of assembling a speaker having first (10) and second (28, 30) components comprises coating at least selected areas of the first component (10) with a heat sensitive coating (12), applying heat (36, 38) to at least one of the first (10) and second (28, 30) components in areas where the first (10) and second (28, 30) components are to be assembled to activate the heat sensitive coating (12) and bringing the first (10) and second (28, 30) components into contact while the heat sensitive coating (12) is activated to assemble them (10, 28, 38) together. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B05D 7/24 (2006.01); H04R 31/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04R 31/006 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] FR 2279298 A1 19760213 - SONY CORP [JP]
- [A] FR 2256619 A1 19750725 - ELEKTROAKUSZTIKAI GYAR [HU]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 435 (E - 1263) 10 September 1992 (1992-09-10)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 81 (E - 107) 19 May 1982 (1982-05-19)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 85 (E - 308) 13 April 1985 (1985-04-13)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 72 (E - 166) 25 March 1983 (1983-03-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 66 (E - 055) 2 May 1981 (1981-05-02)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE DK FR GB IT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0656738 A1 19950607; EP 0656738 B1 19980114; DE 69407936 D1 19980219; DE 69407936 T2 19980430; DK 0656738 T3 19980209; JP 3292784 B2 20020617; JP H07307996 A 19951121
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 94308879 A 19941130; DE 69407936 T 19941130; DK 94308879 T 19941130; JP 30070994 A 19941205