EP 0656747 A4 19970507 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ALTERING DNA SEQUENCES BY HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION.
Title (en)
COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ALTERING DNA SEQUENCES BY HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION.
Title (de)
ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG VON DNS-SEQUENZEN DURCH HOMOLOGE REKOMBINATION.
Title (fr)
COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DE SEQUENCES D'ADN PAR RECOMBINAISON HOMOLOGUE.
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 9307917 W 19930820
- US 93347192 A 19920821
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9404032A1] This invention relates to a composition and method for altering the sequence of a DNA fragment by homologous recombination. More particularly, this invention relates to a method for correcting genetic defects in mammals, particularly in man, by homologous recombination. This invention also relates to a gene therapy method for treating human genetic diseases, including cystic fibrosis, and other diseases, by homologous recombination.
IPC 1-7
A01N 63/00; A61K 31/00; A61K 38/00; C07H 15/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00
IPC 8 full level
A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 15/88 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 14/4712 (2013.01); C12N 15/88 (2013.01); C12N 15/907 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 9011354 A1 19901004 - PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]
- [X] WO 9014092 A1 19901129 - CELL GENESYS INC [US]
- [X] WO 9119796 A1 19911226 - BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]
- [A] WO 9203917 A1 19920319 - GENPHARM INT [US]
- [PX] WO 9220808 A1 19921126 - CELL GENESYS INC [US]
- [E] WO 9322443 A1 19931111 - STANFORD RES INST INT [US]
- [X] A. ZIMMER AND P. GRUSS: "Producing of chimaeric mice containing embryonic stem (ES) cells carrying a homeobox Hox 1.1 allele mutated by homologous recombination", NATURE, vol. 338, 9 March 1989 (1989-03-09), MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD., LONDON,UK, pages 150 - 153, XP002025689
- [A] P. HASTY ET AL.: "Introduction of a subtle mutation into the HOx-2.6 locus in embryonic stem cells", NATURE, vol. 350, 21 March 1991 (1991-03-21), MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD., LONDON,UK, pages 243 - 246, XP002025690
- [A] RIELE TE H ET AL: "HIGHLY EFFICIENT GENE TARGETING IN EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS THROUGH HOMOLOGOUS RECOMBINATION WITH ISOGENIC DNA CONSTRUCTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, vol. 89, 1 June 1992 (1992-06-01), pages 5128 - 5132, XP002006050
- See references of WO 9404032A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9404032 A1 19940303; AU 5087193 A 19940315; EP 0656747 A1 19950614; EP 0656747 A4 19970507
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9307917 W 19930820; AU 5087193 A 19930820; EP 93920268 A 19930820