Global Patent Index - EP 0657528 B1

EP 0657528 B1 2000-03-15 - Percarbonate detergent compositions

Title (en)

Percarbonate detergent compositions

Title (de)

Percarbonathaltige Waschmittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions détergente contenant de percarbonate

Publication

EP 0657528 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93309961 A

Priority

EP 93309961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0657528A1] Stable granular detergent compositions with good flow and dispensing properties are prepared using percarbonate bleach and selected sulfate salts. Thus, particles comprising builders and surfactants are prepared separately from percarbonate bleach particles of defined particle size. Water-soluble sulfate particles having a defined size range and no more than 40 ppm iron and no more than 5 ppm copper are used in the compositions. The specified moisture content of the ingredients and overall compositions improves stability and flow/dispensing properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 7/10 (2006.01); C11D 7/38 (2006.01); C11D 7/54 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); D06L 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/046 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/1253 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0657528 A1 19950614; EP 0657528 B1 20000315; AT 190646 T 20000415; CA 2177676 A1 19950615; CA 2177676 C 20010102; CN 1071785 C 20010926; CN 1142849 A 19970212; DE 69328105 D1 20000420; DE 69328105 T2 20001109; ES 2142851 T3 20000501; JP 2898095 B2 19990531; JP H09508650 A 19970902; WO 9516018 A1 19950615

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131211

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131211

2014-01-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20131209

2013-12-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69328105

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111210

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-01-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-11-13 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020623

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

2001-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-12-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-12-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001210

2000-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142851 T3

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328105 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190646 T 20000415

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980210

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951030

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE