Global Patent Index - EP 0657554 B1

EP 0657554 B1 2000-08-02 - Process for preparing a circular fiberreinforced metallic workpiece

Title (en)

Process for preparing a circular fiberreinforced metallic workpiece

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines ringförmigenfaserverstärkten Metallkörpers

Title (fr)

Procédé d'obtention d'une pièce circulaire métallique renforcée par des fibres

Publication

EP 0657554 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402806 A

Priority

FR 9314698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0657554A1] Process making it possible to produce by isothermal forging circular articles reinforced with fibres over chosen portions of their section, the other portions remaining available for performing the other functions of the article. The invention is noteworthy in that it consists chiefly in producing grooves (8) in a blank (3) of the article (1), in producing preforms (12) from reinforcing fibre and from added metal to the dimensions of the grooves (8), in closing these grooves (8) using plugs (14) and in forming the article (1) by isothermal forging. Application to high-performance rotors such as the rotors of turbine engines employed in aeronautics. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 47/06; B21K 1/76; B23P 15/00; C22C 47/20; C22C 49/11; F01D 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21K 25/00 (2006.01); B21F 17/00 (2006.01); B21K 1/36 (2006.01); B21K 1/76 (2006.01); B22F 3/17 (2006.01); B22F 5/10 (2006.01); B22F 5/12 (2006.01); B22F 7/08 (2006.01); C22C 47/00 (2006.01); C22C 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/17 (2013.01); B21F 17/00 (2013.01); B21K 1/36 (2013.01); B21K 1/761 (2013.01); C22C 47/00 (2013.01); C22C 47/064 (2013.01); C22C 47/068 (2013.01); C22C 47/20 (2013.01); F05B 2250/141 (2013.01); Y10S 72/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0657554 A1 19950614; EP 0657554 B1 20000802; DE 69425418 D1 20000907; DE 69425418 T2 20010315; FR 2713662 A1 19950616; FR 2713662 B1 19960112; JP 3194678 B2 20010730; JP H07197108 A 19950801; US 5562245 A 19961008; US 5642851 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131207

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69425418

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131207

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69425418

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425418 20000907

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 47/06 A, 7C 22C 47/20 B, 7C 22C 49/11 B, 7F 01D 21/04 B, 7B 23P 15/00 B, 7B 21K 1/76 B

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971020

1995-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941217

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB