Global Patent Index - EP 0657580 B1

EP 0657580 B1 2000-05-10 - Dryer section of a paper machine

Title (en)

Dryer section of a paper machine

Title (de)

Trockenpartie einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Section de séchage d'une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0657580 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94119391 A

Priority

US 16441293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5379528A] A drying section of a paper making machine has a series of single tier drying groups, all with their respective felt belts arranged so that the drying cylinders are in contact with and dry one side of the web. The single tier groups are followed by one double tier drying group wherein the web passes such that the top side, then the bottom side, then the top side, then the bottom side, etc. of the web is in contact with successive drying cylinders arranged in two rows. Steam under pressure is supplied to all the drying cylinders. In the double tier group of drying cylinders, the steam pressure supplied to a first set of drying cylinders in sequence is higher than the steam pressure supplied to a second set of drying cylinders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04; D21F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/18 (2006.01); D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/028 (2013.01); D21F 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5379528 A 19950110; AT 192802 T 20000515; CA 2137311 A1 19950610; DE 59409339 D1 20000615; EP 0657580 A2 19950614; EP 0657580 A3 19961218; EP 0657580 B1 20000510; FI 119847 B 20090415; FI 945764 A0 19941208; FI 945764 A 19950610; JP H07229081 A 19950829

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409339

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409339

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051208

2002-07-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011208

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011208

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409339 20000615

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192802 T 20000515

2000-05-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981211

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970424

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE