Global patent index - EP 0657692 B1

EP 0657692 B1 2000-02-02 - Blower for gas premix burner

Title (en)

Blower for gas premix burner

Title (de)

Brennergebläse für Gas-Vormischbrenner

Title (fr)

Ventilateur pour brûleur à prémélange opérant au gaz

Publication

EP 0657692 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94119088 A

Priority

DE 4341340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4443045A1] The blower (50) arranged in a combustion chamber has a drive motor fixed to the blower housing (5). The motor, e.g. a collectorless external rotor motor, is connected to a blower electronics arranged on a printed circuit board. The circuit board includes openings (6) for drawing the air toward the electronics carrier (57) which is fixed to the stator (60) of the motor. A circular aperture (69) is provided between the inner edge of the PCB and a bearing carrier tube (52), to pass the air from the circular chamber (67) to the centre of the blower wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/36; F23D 14/02; F23D 14/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/06 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01); F23D 14/36 (2006.01); F23D 14/62 (2006.01); F23D 14/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/0613 (2013.01); F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23D 14/36 (2013.01); F23D 14/62 (2013.01); F23D 14/82 (2013.01); F23D 2203/1017 (2013.01); F23D 2203/102 (2013.01); F23D 2203/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4443045 A1 19950608; AT 183300 T 19990815; AT 189513 T 20000215; EP 0657692 A2 19950614; EP 0657692 A3 19960124; EP 0657692 B1 20000202; EP 0762051 A2 19970312; EP 0762051 A3 19970402; EP 0762051 B1 19990811; US 5678988 A 19971021; US 5931660 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011203

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20010701

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010701

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001203

2000-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-10-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-02 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DX

2000-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189513

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971021

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960115

1996-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL