Global Patent Index - EP 0657698 B1

EP 0657698 B1 2000-11-15 - Current self-control type glow plug

Title (en)

Current self-control type glow plug

Title (de)

Glühkerze mit Selbsregelung des Stromes

Title (fr)

Bougie à incondescence et à autoréglage de courant

Publication

EP 0657698 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94308900 A

Priority

JP 34119493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0657698A2] A current self-control type glow plug includes a ceramic pipe 2 attached to a hollow body 1 having a connector 12, and a front end portion 15 and a body-side end portion 17 of the pipe 2 are filled with ceramic fillers 6,7. The coil 3 comprises the heating coil part 4 and the control coil part 5. The heating coil part 4 constituting a heating part is arranged in contact with the inner wall surface 20 of the pipe 2. The control coil part 5 constituting a current control part is arranged out of contact with the inner wall surface 20 of the pipe 2. The current control means 10 having a positive resistance-temperature coefficient is connected to the coil 3 and the connector 12. The resistance of the current control means 10 sharply increases above a specified temperature to cut off the current supply to the coil 3. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0657698 A2 19950614; EP 0657698 A3 19960828; EP 0657698 B1 20001115; DE 657698 T1 19960829; DE 69426288 D1 20001221; JP H07167433 A 19950704

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-04-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-02-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426288 20001221

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001115

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990323

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961227

1996-08-29 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-01-12 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB