Global Patent Index - EP 0657967 B1

EP 0657967 B1 2000-04-05 - Pin coupling for locking the connection between a male connector and a female connector of a co-axial cable

Title (en)

Pin coupling for locking the connection between a male connector and a female connector of a co-axial cable

Title (de)

Stiftkupplung zum Verriegeln der Verbindung zwischen einem Stecker und einem Komplementärstecker eines Koaxialkabels

Title (fr)

Broche d'accouplement pour le verrouillage de la connexion entre un connecteur mâle et un connecteur femelle d'un câble coaxial

Publication

EP 0657967 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94119310 A

Priority

IT VI930197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0657967A1] A pin coupling for locking the connection between a male connector (2) and a female connector (6) connecting co-axial cables (1, 15) comprises: a male cap (10) lodging inside one of the two connectors and a female cap (16, 20) lodging another connector (6, 2) and a second co-axial cable and is characterized in that said male cap (10) and said female connector (16, 20) lock in the closed position of their connection through the snapping action of locking means belonging to each cap and co-operating with two annular projecting parts (9b, 9c) being present on the outer metal screen belonging to the female or male connector (6, 2) lodging inside the cap (16,20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6271 (2013.01); H01R 13/5202 (2013.01); H01R 13/5219 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0657967 A1 19950614; EP 0657967 B1 20000405; DE 69423855 D1 20000511; IT 1270760 B 19970507; IT VI930197 A1 19950613; IT VI930197 D0 19931213

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423855 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980421

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951214

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB