Global Patent Index - EP 0658231 B1

EP 0658231 B1 2000-01-12 - WATER PROOFING LINER

Title (en)

WATER PROOFING LINER

Title (de)

WASSERABDICHTUNGSBAHN

Title (fr)

REVETEMENT D'ETANCHEITE

Publication

EP 0658231 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94908846 A

Priority

  • GB 9301807 W
  • GB 9218178 A
  • GB 9309586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9405863A2] There is described a water-proofing material (10) basically made from a plastic mass containing a liquid and particulate smectite clay, usually montmorillonite such as bentonite, which can be united with a carrier sheet (20). The plastic mass can contain aqueous and/or non-aqueous liquid which can be expelled after forming. The smectite clay can be a smectite liner intercalation complex and the mass is desirably formed by extrusion, in the latter case preferably during reaction of the clay and can have a density of at least 1000 kg/m-3 and can be 1 m or more wide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 31/004 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9405863 A2 19940317; WO 9405863 A3 19940915; AU 4969693 A 19940329; AU 677228 B2 19970417; CA 2143297 A1 19940317; CA 2143297 C 20051018; DE 69327589 D1 20000217; DE 69327589 T2 20000621; DE 69327589 T3 20040513; DK 0658231 T3 20000626; DK 0658231 T4 20040105; EP 0658231 A1 19950621; EP 0658231 B1 20000112; EP 0658231 B2 20030903; IN 187413 B 20020420; MD 1818 F2 20011231; MD 960270 A 19991231; SG 50604 A1 19980720; TJ 389 B 20041013

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69327589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-04-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-03-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RAWELL GROUP HOLDINGS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69327589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110902

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-05-28 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2004-01-05 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2004-01-05 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-12-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2003-11-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IE NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: GEORG BAUMNN

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: GEORG BAUMNN

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-06-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69327589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IE NL

1995-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19951106

1995-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950315

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IE NL