Global Patent Index - EP 0658723 B1

EP 0658723 B1 2000-05-31 - Thermal insulation

Title (en)

Thermal insulation

Title (de)

Thermische Isolation

Title (fr)

Isolation thermique

Publication

EP 0658723 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94119579 A

Priority

DE 4343120 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0658723A2] The invention relates to thermal insulation (3) for internal areas of combustion installations and gas turbines (1). The thermal insulation used for this is exposed to the destructive effects of the hot gases of these installations. The thermal insulation (3) according to the invention is provided with protection (5) in the area of its surfaces (3S) which are in contact with the hot gases. This protection (5) is formed by rod- or plate-shaped reinforcing elements (1) which are partly or fully integrated in the surface (3S). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/22 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24182 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0658723 A2 19950621; EP 0658723 A3 19960410; EP 0658723 B1 20000531; DE 4343120 A1 19950622; JP H07253209 A 19951003; US 5709919 A 19980120

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011001

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409386 20000706

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980421

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960917

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB