Global patent index - EP 0658775 B1

EP 0658775 B1 2000-02-23 - Anticollision device for automotive vehicle

Title (en)

Anticollision device for automotive vehicle

Title (de)

Kollisionsschutzeinrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'anticollision, notamment pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0658775 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402842 A

Priority

FR 9314991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0658775A1] The invention relates to an anti-collision device. A moving object (1) proceeding in a given direction along a displacement vector (D) and having a relative speed vector (VR) directed towards an obstacle (3), is equipped with at least two antennae emitting a UHF signal capable of being received by the obstacle (3). The device further includes means for receiving and analysing the echoes received from the obstacle (3), the analysis means determining the variation with respect to time of the angle ( theta ) between the displacement vector (D) and the relative speed vector (VR), a substantially zero variation of the angle ( theta ) indicating a risk of collision. Application: equipment of motor vehicles for avoiding collisions, particularly in poor visibility conditions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 13/93

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01P 13/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/00 (2006.01); B60W 30/00 (2006.01); G01S 13/93 (2006.01); G08G 1/16 (2006.01); G01S 13/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 13/931 (2013.01); G01S 13/48 (2013.01); G01S 2013/9375 (2013.01); G01S 2013/9396 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4148028 A 19790403 - FUJIKI NORIO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0658775 A1 19950621; EP 0658775 B1 20000223; DE 69423079 D1 20000330; DE 69423079 T2 20000713; FR 2713808 A1 19950616; FR 2713808 B1 19960126; JP H07209418 A 19950811; US 5534870 A 19960709

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-07-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423079

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980331

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951215

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB