Global Patent Index - EP 0659010 B1

EP 0659010 B1 2000-05-10 - Electronic apparatus having display device

Title (en)

Electronic apparatus having display device

Title (de)

Elektronisches Gerät mit Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil électronique ayant un dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 0659010 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94119879 A

Priority

JP 34314593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659010A1] In an electronic apparatus provided with a display device, hinge portions for rotatably holding the display device on the apparatus body are provided in two portions on the display device, and the display device is so arranged that it is rotatable in one direction about one hinge portion or rotatable in another direction about the other hinge portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/00; E05D 15/50; G06F 1/16; G06F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/30 (2006.01); E05D 15/50 (2006.01); G06F 1/16 (2006.01); G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/203 (2006.01); H04N 1/21 (2006.01); H04N 1/12 (2006.01); H04N 1/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/2175 (2013.01); G06F 1/16 (2013.01); G06F 3/002 (2013.01); H04N 1/00127 (2013.01); H04N 1/00129 (2013.01); H04N 1/00384 (2013.01); H04N 1/00496 (2013.01); H04N 1/203 (2013.01); H04N 1/2034 (2013.01); E05D 15/505 (2013.01); E05D 15/507 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/606 (2013.01); G06F 2200/1631 (2013.01); H04N 1/12 (2013.01); H04N 1/193 (2013.01); H04N 2201/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0659010 A1 19950621; EP 0659010 B1 20000510; DE 69424384 D1 20000615; DE 69424384 T2 20001012; JP 3170986 B2 20010528; JP H07168530 A 19950704; US 5719645 A 19980217

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081215

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424384 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980220

1996-02-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951214

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB