Global patent index - EP 0659029 B1

EP 0659029 B1 2000-10-18 - Loudspeaker selection device

Title (en)

Loudspeaker selection device

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Umschalten eines Lautsprechers

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sélection d'un haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0659029 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94119808 A

Priority

DE 4342917 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659029A2] Radio equipment such as car telephones, service transceivers and the like are increasingly being installed in motor vehicles. Such equipment makes the user quite independent and more mobile. This advantage also necessarily entails a safety risk in that the concentration and reaction to the road traffic of a vehicle driver using such equipment deteriorate since, in most cases, he must hold a receiver in his hand for operating the transceiver and thus then only has one hand for steering the vehicle. This is remedied by so-called hands-free talking devices in which speaking is done via a permanently mounted microphone and listening is done via a loudspeaker. The invention describes a device which is of simple construction and enables a loudspeaker to be used which is already available in the motor vehicle for an audio device. The device is of very small construction and is installed so easily that, in particular, it is also suitable for subsequent installation in a motor vehicle. Due to the use of the installed loudspeaker, the quality of reproduction is very good. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/12; H04B 1/38; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/12 (2006.01); H04R 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/12 (2013.01); H04R 5/04 (2013.01); H04R 2420/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0659029 A2 19950621; EP 0659029 A3 19960207; EP 0659029 B1 20001018; AT 197107 T 20001115; DE 4342917 A1 19950622

INPADOC legal status

2014-12-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-06-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2004-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-04-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-27 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-12-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409552

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-23

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197107

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991005

1997-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960228

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1995-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG E.M.V. ELEKTRO-MECHANISCHE VERSUCHSANSTALT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT