Global Patent Index - EP 0659228 B1

EP 0659228 B1 2000-02-02 - A WINDOW, A DOOR OR THE LIKE AND IN PARTICULAR A SLIDE MOUNTING PROVIDED FOR SAME

Title (en)

A WINDOW, A DOOR OR THE LIKE AND IN PARTICULAR A SLIDE MOUNTING PROVIDED FOR SAME

Title (de)

FENSTER, TÜR ODER DERGLEICHEN UND INSBESONDERE EINE GLEITANORDNUNG HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

FENETRE OU PORTE ET LEUR MONTAGE COULISSANT

Publication

EP 0659228 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93919786 A

Priority

  • SE 9300721 W
  • SE 9202552 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9405881A1] In a window (1) a frame (2) is pivotably inserted in a casement (3) by means of swinging armatures, the side pieces (47) of the casement being provided with longitudinal grooves (25) in order to guide sliding armatures (15), which belong to sliding arms (24) and are positioned at the top of the side pieces (4) of the frame and designed to retain this frame end in the casement, when the frame is swung e.g. 180 . In accordance with the invention the sliding armature (15) is provided with a locking shoulder (36), which, when the frame is closed, protrudes above the frame roughly parallel to said groove and is designed to, in the closing phase, mesh with a recess (40) in the upper piece of the casement and be pressed against its wall (49), turned away from the groove (25), in order to partly form a burglary protection and partly provide an extra sealing effect for this part of the frame against the corresponding casement part. The fastening end (26) of the swinging arm (22) of the sliding armature is by a bending parallel-displaced in relation to the main part (23) of the arm, which allows a swinging of mainly only said main part with its thickness in the respective gap (51) between the casement and the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/44; E05D 15/30; E06B 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/44 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9405881 A1 19940317; DE 69327790 D1 20000309; DK 0659228 T3 20001204; DK 0659228 T4 20050808; EP 0659228 A1 19950628; EP 0659228 B1 20000202; EP 0659228 B2 20050720; NO 306824 B1 19991227; NO 950837 A 19950303; NO 950837 D0 19950303; SE 9202552 D0 19920907; SE 9202552 L 19940308

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130906

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130905

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-09-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130905

2013-09-08 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120709

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-10-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-08-16 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2005-08-08 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2005-07-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IE SE

2004-10-13 [29W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 29W

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-09-22 [29U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) AFTER GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 29U

- Effective date: 20040314

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AS SPILKA INDUSTRI

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-12-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69327790

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IE SE

1996-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960531

1995-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950307

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB IE SE