Global Patent Index - EP 0659353 B1

EP 0659353 B1 2000-07-05 - Kit for making a smoking article

Title (en)

Kit for making a smoking article

Title (de)

Satz für die Herstellung eines Rauchartikels

Title (fr)

Equipement pour la fabrication d'un article à fumer

Publication

EP 0659353 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309692 A

Priority

  • EP 94309692 A
  • EP 93310504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659353A1] A kit for making a smoking article comprises a hull 10 which itself comprises a hollow cylinder 14 of cigarette paper having a filter at one end joined to it by tipping 16. The kit also includes a rectangular sheet 12 of reconstituted tobacco, the long side of which is the same length as the cylinder. The smoker rolls the sheet into a cylindrical shape and inserts it into the hull to make a cigarette. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/00 (2006.01); A24C 5/40 (2006.01); A24D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0659353 A1 19950628; EP 0659353 B1 20000705; AT 194265 T 20000715; AU 687469 B2 19980226; AU 8170694 A 19950629; BR 9405223 A 19950801; CA 2138735 A1 19950624; CO 4370091 A1 19961007; DE 69425120 D1 20000810; DE 69425120 T2 20010315; DK 0659353 T3 20001030; ES 2149847 T3 20001116; GR 3034553 T3 20010131; NZ 270273 A 19970922; PT 659353 E 20001229; SI 659353 T1 20001231

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041231

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20041223

2005-12-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2005-10-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-07-25 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-07-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-06-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2005-01-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-12-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041222

2003-12-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-20 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149847

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-10-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69425120

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19950119;SI PAYMENT 19950119

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194265

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970113

1997-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970113

1995-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950706

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-06-28 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 950119;SI PAYMENT 950119