Global Patent Index - EP 0659539 B1

EP 0659539 B1 2000-03-22 - Process for attaching handles on metallic containers and apparatus for carrying out this process

Title (en)

Process for attaching handles on metallic containers and apparatus for carrying out this process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anbringen von Henkeln an Behälter aus Metall sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour placer des anses sur des récipients métalliques et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0659539 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93120864 A

Priority

EP 93120864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659539A1] Handles (6, 13) made from plastic strip (1) are successively brought, with holes (7) provided in each case at their ends, into a position, in relation to successively supplied containers (9), intended for the fastening of the handles (6, 13). Then in each case an eye (16, 17) is brought in front of a hole, the cylindrical part of which eye has an external diameter corresponding to the diameter of the hole (7) at the end of the handle (6, 13) and has bulges at its end facing the container (9) while its flange is directed away from the container (9). Then, welding electrodes, at the tip of which there are preferably centring pins, are guided against or into the eyes (16, 17) which are thus moved into the holes (7) in the handles (6, 13) until the bulges of the eyes (16, 17) butt against the outer wall of the containers (9), counter-electrodes in each case bearing against the inner side of the containers (9) and a welding current being supplied for bulge welding. The bulge welding is simple, does not affect the handles which are made of plastic and makes subsequent assembly operations superfluous. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 65/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 45/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0659539 A1 19950628; EP 0659539 B1 20000322; DE 59309988 D1 20000427; ES 2145760 T3 20000716

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121224

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-10-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59309988

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121224

2013-08-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59309988

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111224

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101231

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061226

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061226

2005-12-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145760 T3

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59309988 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-12-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEUE MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

1998-06-17 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19980301

1998-06-17 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 19981007

1997-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MFB WERKZEUGSYSTEME UND ANLAGEN GMBH

1996-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961108

1996-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951213

1995-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT K.H.K. BODYFORMING MBH

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL