Global Patent Index - EP 0659936 B1

EP 0659936 B1 2000-04-12 - Security paper with thread- or tape-like security element

Title (en)

Security paper with thread- or tape-like security element

Title (de)

Sicherheitspapier mit einem faden- oder bandförmigen Sicherheitselement

Title (fr)

Papier de sécurité contenant un élément de sécurité en forme de fil ou de bande

Publication

EP 0659936 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94120464 A

Priority

DE 4344298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659936A2] The invention relates to a security paper having a security element in the form of a thread or tape which consists of a translucent plastic film having at least partially opaque coating. The security element has at least one first opaque coating and a translucent region adjoining this opaque coating, as well as items of information which extend from the first opaque coating into the translucent region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/00 (2006.01); B42D 25/355 (2014.01); D21H 21/44 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01); G07D 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/44 (2013.01); B42D 25/355 (2014.10); G07D 7/12 (2013.01); G07D 7/20 (2013.01); Y10S 428/916 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0659936 A2 19950628; EP 0659936 A3 19960207; EP 0659936 B1 20000412; AT 191760 T 20000415; DE 4344298 A1 19950629; ES 2144030 T3 20000601; FI 115545 B 20050531; FI 946078 A0 19941223; FI 946078 A 19950624; US 5573639 A 19961112

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 191760 T

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-01-14 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141221

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-12-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409288

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131223

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-05-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409288

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131231

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. ALFREDO RAIMONDI

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144030 T3

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409288 20000518

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191760 T 20000415

1997-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961118

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE