Global Patent Index - EP 0659940 B1

EP 0659940 B1 2000-04-19 - Floating breakwater having improved wave impact stability

Title (en)

Floating breakwater having improved wave impact stability

Title (de)

Treibender Wellenbrecher mit verbesserter Schlagfestigkeit gegen Wellen

Title (fr)

Brise-lames flottant ayant un stabilité améliorée contre l'impact des vagues

Publication

EP 0659940 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94120341 A

Priority

IT MI932692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659940A1] A floating breakwater having improved wave impact stability which comprises a first floating barrier and a second floating barrier which lie longitudinally and are kept mutually spaced and joined by a framework provided with transverse elements. The particularity of the invention, in addition to the fact that it has the above described geometrical configuration, is also that each one of the floating barriers is provided by means of floating bodies that form an upper floating volume and a lower ballasting mass. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02B 3/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0659940 A1 19950628; EP 0659940 B1 20000419; IT 1265316 B1 19961031; IT MI932692 A1 19950622; IT MI932692 D0 19931221

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131231

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO EDER AG

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971117

1996-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951129

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR LI