Global patent index - EP 0659947 B1

EP 0659947 B1 2000-06-28 - Control device for a vacuum actuated stop valve

Title (en)

Control device for a vacuum actuated stop valve

Title (de)

Steueranordnung für ein durch Unterdruck betätigbares Absperrventil

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour une vanne d'obturation actionnée par dépression

Publication

EP 0659947 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94119697 A

Priority

DE 4343733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0659947A2] The invention relates to a control arrangement (10) for a shut-off valve which can be actuated by subatmospheric pressure and is intended for a subatmospheric-sewage system. The control arrangement comprises a main piston (22) via which valves (70, 72) can be actuated, in order to open and to close an extraction valve and an aeration valve independently of one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/122 (2006.01); E03F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/006 (2013.01); Y10S 137/907 (2013.01); Y10T 137/3109 (2015.04); Y10T 137/86389 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4343733 A1 19950622; EP 0659947 A2 19950628; EP 0659947 A3 19960731; EP 0659947 B1 20000628; JP H07253175 A 19951003; US 5634494 A 19970603

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081214

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081214

2009-08-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061204

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409410

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROEDIGER VAKUUM- UND HAUSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990927

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960725

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

1996-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI

1995-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

1995-06-28 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: SI