Global Patent Index - EP 0660058 B1

EP 0660058 B1 2001-04-11 - Air separation

Title (en)

Air separation

Title (de)

Lufttrennung

Title (fr)

Séparation d'air

Publication

EP 0660058 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309108 A

Priority

GB 9326168 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0660058A2] A stream of air is compressed in compressor 2 and has water vapour and carbon dioxide removed therefrom in purification unit 4. A part of the resulting purified air is cooled by passage through heat exchanger 6 and is employed to heat an intermediate reboiler 24 in a lower pressure rectification column 42. The air flow from the reboiler 24 passes into a higher pressure rectification column 20 which supplies a stream of oxygen-enriched liquid air for separation in the lower pressure rectification column 42. Liquid nitrogen reflux for the higher pressure column 20 is provided by taking nitrogen vapour from this column through outlet 30 and condensing it in another intermediate reboiler 32 located above the reboiler 24 in the rectification column 42. The condensed nitrogen is returned to the top of the column 20. Another air stream is employed to reboil a further reboiler 16 at the bottom of the lower pressure rectification column 42 with the resulting condensed air stream being introduced into the higher pressure rectification column 20 through an inlet 22. An impure oxygen product is withdrawn from the bottom of the lower pressure rectification column 42 through outlet 58 in liquid state and is vaporised in the heat exchanger 6. The arrangement of reboilers 16, 24 and 32 facilitates operation of the apparatus with a relatively low pressure ratio between the operating pressure of the column 20 and that of the column 42. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/042 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04212 (2013.01); F25J 3/04296 (2013.01); F25J 3/04418 (2013.01); F25J 3/0446 (2013.01); F25J 3/04878 (2013.01); F25J 2200/04 (2013.01); F25J 2200/38 (2013.01); F25J 2200/54 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); F25J 2215/50 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01); F25J 2250/20 (2013.01); F25J 2250/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0660058 A2 19950628; EP 0660058 A3 19951102; EP 0660058 B1 20010411; AU 690152 B2 19980423; AU 8031594 A 19950629; CA 2138512 A1 19950623; CN 1084870 C 20020515; CN 1107572 A 19950830; DE 69427072 D1 20010517; DE 69427072 T2 20011011; FI 945993 A0 19941221; FI 945993 A 19950623; GB 9326168 D0 19940223; JP H07218122 A 19950818; NO 944970 A 19950623; NO 944970 D0 19941221; TW 258667 B 19951001; ZA 9409544 B 19950908

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021207

2002-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427072 20010517

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-04-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951201

1995-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE