Global Patent Index - EP 0660439 B1

EP 0660439 B1 2000-03-01 - TM dual mode dielectric resonator, adjusting and manufacturing method therefor

Title (en)

TM dual mode dielectric resonator, adjusting and manufacturing method therefor

Title (de)

Resonator im Zweifach-TM-Modus, Verfahren zu seinem Justieren und zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Résonateur diélectrique à double mode TM, sa méthode d'ajustement et fabrication

Publication

EP 0660439 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94119860 A

Priority

JP 34759293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0660439A2] In a TM dual mode dielectric resonator apparatus, a cross-shaped TM dual mode dielectric resonator is provided in an electrically conductive case, and the TM dual mode dielectric resonator includes first and second dielectric resonators integrally formed so as to be perpendicular to each other, and there is further formed at least one coupling groove for coupling an operation mode of the first dielectric resonator with that mode of the second dielectric resonator, wherein the coupling groove is formed on at least one of front and back surfaces of a crossing portion of the first and second dielectric resonators, in a diagonal direction thereof so as to cut electric lines of force of either one of an odd mode and an even mode. Alternatively, at least one coupling projection may be formed in stead of the coupling groove. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208; H01P 7/10; H01P 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/20 (2006.01); H01P 1/208 (2006.01); H01P 5/04 (2006.01); H01P 7/10 (2006.01); H01P 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/10 (2013.01); H01P 11/008 (2013.01); Y10S 425/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0660439 A2 19950628; EP 0660439 A3 19960214; EP 0660439 B1 20000301; DE 69423195 D1 20000406; DE 69423195 T2 20000921; FI 118361 B 20071015; FI 945988 A0 19941221; FI 945988 A 19950625; JP 3298279 B2 20020702; JP H07193405 A 19950728; US 5659275 A 19970819; US 5780072 A 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423195

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131215

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69423195

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130107

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423195 20000406

2000-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980723

1996-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-02-14 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01P 1/208

1995-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941215

1995-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB