Global Patent Index - EP 0660757 B1

EP 0660757 B1 2000-01-19 - WAFER RETAINING PLATEN AND LIFTING MEANS

Title (en)

WAFER RETAINING PLATEN AND LIFTING MEANS

Title (de)

WAFERHALTEPLATTE UND HEBEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PLATINE DE RETENUE ET MOYENS DE LEVAGE POUR TRANCHES

Publication

EP 0660757 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94920197 A

Priority

  • US 9406708 W
  • US 7650993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5350427A] An apparatus for releasably holding a workpiece in semiconductor process systems such as a batch ion implanter which comprises a linkage mechanism mounted onto the backside of the platen for clamping the wafer against the fence of the supporting means and pusher means mounted on wafer lift means for engagement with the lever mechanism for locking and unlocking the device, and sensing any misclamp of the workpiece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 13/00; B05C 11/02; H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/683 (2006.01); H01L 21/265 (2006.01); H01L 21/687 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/68721 (2013.01); H01L 21/68742 (2013.01); Y10T 29/41 (2013.01); Y10T 279/247 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5350427 A 19940927; CN 1047331 C 19991215; CN 1110869 A 19951025; DE 69422700 D1 20000224; DE 69422700 T2 20000831; EP 0660757 A1 19950705; EP 0660757 A4 19951025; EP 0660757 B1 20000119; JP 3381173 B2 20030224; JP H10508153 A 19980804; WO 9429036 A1 19941222

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060613

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060613

2005-08-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050801

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: VARIAN SEMICONDUCTOR EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATES INC.

2000-05-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VARIAN SEMICONDUCTOR EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATES INC.

2000-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69422700 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1997-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970403

1995-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19950907

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1995-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950217

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE