Global patent index - EP 0661014 A3

EP 0661014 A3 2000-02-23 - Device for adjusting the height and/or the inclination of a table top

Title (en)

Device for adjusting the height and/or the inclination of a table top

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verstellen der Höhe und/oder Neigung einer Tischplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la variation de la hauteur et/ou de l'inclinaison d'une surface de travail

Publication

EP 0661014 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 94119287 A

Priority

DE 4342016 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0661014A2] Device for adjusting the height and/or the inclination of a table top (10). Provided between the table top (10) and a supporting frame (12) is a parallelogram linkage (1, 2, 3, 4) which allows both height adjustment and inclination adjustment in both directions by means of an adjusting device (20) as a function of the displacement of articulation points (1, 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 17/02 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0026 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0041 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0042 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4342016 A1 19950614; EP 0661014 A2 19950705; EP 0661014 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI NL

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI NL