Global Patent Index - EP 0661136 B1

EP 0661136 B1 2000-05-10 - Method for honing the surface of a workpiece and honing tool for carring out said method

Title (en)

Method for honing the surface of a workpiece and honing tool for carring out said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Honen der Oberfläche eines Teiles und Honwerkzeug zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de rodage de la surface d'une pièce et rodoir pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0661136 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402696 A

Priority

FR 9314325 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0661136A1] The present invention relates to a method for honing (lapping) the surface of a component and to a honing tool (lap) of the expanding type for employing this method. The method of the invention consists especially in calibrating a first cylindrical part (14a) of the external abrasive surface of the honing tool by bringing it into contact with a reference region of the surface to be honed (15a) in progressively removing a protruding part (16a) by bringing it into contact with a second, frustoconical part (14b) of the said external surface, and in calibrating the region from which the protruding part has been removed by bringing it into contact with the said previously calibrated cylindrical part. The invention applies particularly to the honing of cylindrical barrels including a hard metal coating obtained by an electrolytic deposition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 33/02; B24B 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/02 (2006.01); B24B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/085 (2013.01); B24B 33/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0661136 A1 19950705; EP 0661136 B1 20000510; DE 69424391 D1 20000615; FR 2713123 A1 19950609; FR 2713123 B1 19960126

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-08-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424391 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980907

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951004

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT