Global patent index - EP 0661409 B1

EP 0661409 B1 2000-02-23 - Lock and locking assembly for a door or window

Title (en)

Lock and locking assembly for a door or window

Title (de)

Schloss und Schlossvorrichtung für eine Tür oder ein fenster

Title (fr)

Serrure et ensemble serrure pour porte ou fenêtre

Publication

EP 0661409 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309895 A

Priority

GB 9326532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2313620A] A multi-point locking assembly for a door or window comprises a main lock (1) having a spring loaded latch (2) and a deadbolt (3) operated by a deadbolt operating mechanism under the control of a key operated deadlocking mechanism, and at least one additional remote locking device (4, 5) having a locking member (6, 7) which is advanced and retracted simultaneously with the deadbolt in response to linear movement of a connector bar (19, 20) by operation of the deadbolt operating mechanism. The locking member (6, 7) of each additional locking device (4, 5) comprises a hook which is mounted to pivot between its advanced and retracted positions by linear movement of a slide plate (105, 114) which is connected to the connector bar (19, 20) and which is connected to the hook (6, 7) by means of a pin (110, 115) carried by either the hook or the slide plate and engaging in a slot (111, 116) in the slide plate or the hook respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04; E05B 17/20; E05B 63/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 17/20 (2006.01); E05B 59/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/16 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1875 (2013.01); E05B 15/024 (2013.01); E05B 17/2049 (2013.01); E05B 59/00 (2013.01); E05B 63/16 (2013.01); E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB NL PT

EPO simple patent family

GB 2313620 A 19971203; GB 2313620 B 19980603; GB 9716890 D0 19971015; DE 69423084 D1 20000330; DE 69423084 T2 20000621; EP 0661409 A2 19950705; EP 0661409 A3 19960410; EP 0661409 B1 20000223; ES 2142385 T3 20000416; GB 2285280 A 19950705; GB 2285280 B 19980603; GB 9326532 D0 19940302

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061229

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061229

2005-12-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-01-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020109

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-12-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142385

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL PT

2000-02-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000223

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980511

1997-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CEGO FRAMEWARE LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961008

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL PT

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL PT