Global Patent Index - EP 0661447 B1

EP 0661447 B1 2000-10-18 - Diesel engine with direct fuel injection

Title (en)

Diesel engine with direct fuel injection

Title (de)

Dieselmotor mit direkter Kraftstoffeinspritzung

Title (fr)

Moteur diesel à injection de combustible directe

Publication

EP 0661447 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94120612 A

Priority

DE 4344026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0661447A1] The present invention relates to an injection nozzle (4) for diesel engines with direct fuel injection into combustion air in the combustion space, to which air a swirl has been imparted. The nozzle is designed as a hole-type nozzle with a plurality of injection openings (8, 9) arranged at uniform intervals around the circumference of the nozzle. In order to develop an injection nozzle (4) of this kind so as to permit shorter injection durations and improved air utilisation, an additional injection opening (9) with a smaller diameter is in each case formed between two adjacent injection openings (8), making the total cross-sectional area of all the injection openings (8, 9) greater without the fuel jets thereby formed being blown into one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 23/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1826 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4344026 A1 19950629; DE 4344026 C2 19970918; EP 0661447 A1 19950705; EP 0661447 B1 20001018; JP H07208303 A 19950808; US 5667145 A 19970916

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081223

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081223

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-01 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20041026

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20010703

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DIESEL ENGINE WITH DIRECT FUEL INJECTION

1996-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960221

1995-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941223

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT