Global Patent Index - EP 0661606 B1

EP 0661606 B1 2000-09-20 - Charging device, image forming apparatus having the charging device and manufacturing method for the device

Title (en)

Charging device, image forming apparatus having the charging device and manufacturing method for the device

Title (de)

Aufladevorrichtung, Bilderzeugungsgerät mit der Aufladevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chargement, appareil de formation d'images contenant le dispositif de chargement et procédé de fabrication d'un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0661606 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94120863 A

Priority

  • JP 33637093 A
  • JP 14700394 A
  • JP 28154394 A
  • JP 29934794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0661606A2] A charging device for charging a movable object to be charged, has a charging member which contacts with the object to be charged, and a power source for applying a voltage to the charging member, wherein the power spectrum PS satisfies the following relation when the space frequency of the profile of the surface of the charging member is analyzed. In the section of 10 </= f </= 100 (cycles/mm): PS </= -2.5 x log (f/2) ( mu m<2>> The invention therefore presents a charging device capable of preventing charge unevenness due to undulations on the surface of the charging member, and charging uniformly, and generating very little ozone. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0661606 A2 19950705; EP 0661606 A3 19960221; EP 0661606 B1 20000920; DE 69425954 D1 20001026; DE 69425954 T2 20010118; US 5548380 A 19960820; US 5776544 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061228

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061228

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-12-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425954 20001026

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CHARGING DEVICE, IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS HAVING THE CHARGING DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR THE DEVICE

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1996-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960621

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB