Global Patent Index - EP 0662045 B2

EP 0662045 B2 2002-11-20 - MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MAKING A SHEET OF SINGLE FACE CORRUGATED CARDBOARD

Title (en)

MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MAKING A SHEET OF SINGLE FACE CORRUGATED CARDBOARD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINSEITIGER WELLPAPPE

Title (fr)

MACHINE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE FEUILLE DE CARTON ONDULE SIMPLE FACE

Publication

EP 0662045 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 94922934 A

Priority

  • FR 9308909 A
  • FR 9400896 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9503166A1] A machine (1) and a method for making a sheet (36) of a single face corrugated cardboard by gluing a fluted cardboard sheet (23) onto a planar cardboard sheet (24), said machine including three substantially tangentially paired heating rollers with parallel axes. The machine comprises a fourth smooth heating roller (26) having an axis (27) parallel to the other rollers, and being arranged further down the corrugated board path than said other rollers for holding the fluted sheet against the second roller (13) over an arc of circumference which corresponds to a central angle alpha having a first predetermined value. Said fourth roller also engages the back of the planar sheet over an arc of circumference which corresponds to a central angle beta having a second predetermined value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/28; B32B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/28 (2006.01); B32B 3/28 (2006.01); B32B 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/2854 (2013.01); B31F 1/285 (2013.01); B31F 1/2877 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1016 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2708011 A1 19950127; FR 2708011 B1 19951013; AT 179113 T 19990515; AU 690914 B2 19980507; AU 7266594 A 19950220; BR 9405547 A 19990908; CA 2144984 A1 19950202; CN 1112781 A 19951129; CZ 9501016 A3 19951213; DE 69418015 D1 19990527; DE 69418015 T2 19991118; DE 69418015 T3 20030522; DE 9421377 U1 19951221; DK 0662045 T3 19991101; EP 0662045 A1 19950712; EP 0662045 B1 19990421; EP 0662045 B2 20021120; ES 2132418 T3 19990816; ES 2132418 T5 20030316; FI 951229 A0 19950316; FI 951229 A 19950316; JP H08501740 A 19960227; NO 951043 A 19950522; NO 951043 D0 19950317; NZ 278300 A 19960528; PL 175160 B1 19981130; PL 308126 A1 19950724; TR 28247 A 19960328; TW 290496 B 19961111; US 5614048 A 19970325; WO 9503166 A1 19950202; ZA 9405270 B 19950808

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120719

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69418015

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120718

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110708

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110715

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050718

2005-07-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050718

2004-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OTOR

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-30 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-01-29 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-12-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2002-11-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020701

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020624

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-06-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-06-05 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: 3 V GMBH

2000-03-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: 3 V GMBH

- Effective date: 20000120

1999-11-01 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

1999-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19990802

1999-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2132418 T3

1999-07-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990718

1999-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69418015 19990527

1999-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

1999-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: JOHN P. MUNZINGER INGENIEUR-CONSEIL

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-04-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19990421

1999-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 179113 T 19990515

1996-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961031

1995-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950410

1995-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE