Global Patent Index - EP 0662117 B1

EP 0662117 B1 2000-06-21 - WEAKLY ALKALINE WASHING-UP AGENT

Title (en)

WEAKLY ALKALINE WASHING-UP AGENT

Title (de)

SCHWACHALKALISCHE GESCHIRREINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT FAIBLEMENT ALCALIN POUR LAVE-VAISSELLE

Publication

EP 0662117 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93920745 A

Priority

  • DE 4232170 A
  • EP 9302510 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4232170A1] Disclosed is a weakly alkaline washing-up agent for use in dishwashers, the agent containing essentially sodium citrate, alkalihydrocarbonate, a bleaching agent, a bleach activator and enzymes and has a pH of about 8 to < 10, preferably about 9 to 9.5, when in 1 % by wt. aqueous solution. It may also contain corrosion inhibitors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/10; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38609 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/3907 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4232170 A1 19940331; DE 4232170 C2 19990916; AT 194012 T 20000715; CA 2145663 A1 19940414; DK 0662117 T3 20001023; EP 0662117 A1 19950712; EP 0662117 B1 20000621; ES 2148239 T3 20001016; GR 3033851 T3 20001031; JP H08501598 A 19960220; PT 662117 E 20001229; WO 9407981 A1 19940414

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130917

2014-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140925

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130915

2013-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 194012 T

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130917

2013-10-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130915

2013-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-09-18 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-09-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59310064

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121004

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-07-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-09-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010916

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-10-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148239 T3

2000-09-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20000928

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000922

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-12 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20000912

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000906

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310064 20000727

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194012 T 20000715

1999-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 11D 3/10 A, 6C 11D 17/00 B

1999-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 11D 3/10 A, 6C 11D 17/00 B

1996-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960809

1995-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950131

1995-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE