Global Patent Index - EP 0662118 B1

EP 0662118 B1 2001-05-16 - USE OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING LIME SOAP DISPERSANT AND LIPASE ENZYMES

Title (en)

USE OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING LIME SOAP DISPERSANT AND LIPASE ENZYMES

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER KALKSEIFENDISPERGATOR UND LIPASEHALTIGE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE DETERGENT CONTENANT UN DISPERSANT DE SAVON DE CHAUX ET DES LIPASES

Publication

EP 0662118 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93922706 A

Priority

  • EP 93922706 A
  • EP 93870170 A
  • GB 9220343 A
  • US 9308875 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 1/75; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0662118 A1 19950712; EP 0662118 A4 19980429; EP 0662118 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050920

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030922

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030920

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-09-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030921

2003-09-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030920

2002-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-09-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-09-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-09-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020903

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-07-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-09-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-08-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156586 T3

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69330230 20010621

2001-06-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201228 T 20010615

2000-08-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF A DETERGENT COMPOSITION COMPRISING LIME SOAP DISPERSANT AND LIPASE ENZYMES

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990202

1998-04-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980312

1998-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1995-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950224

1995-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE