Global Patent Index - EP 0662248 A4

EP 0662248 A4 2000-10-25 - ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE

Title (en)

ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE

Title (de)

Energiespeicherungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ACCUMULATION D'ENERGIE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0662248 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 93921652 A

Priority

  • US 9308803 W
  • US 94741492 A
  • US 94729492 A
  • US 95850692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9407272A1] A dry preunit (10), includes a plurality of cells (110, 112, 114) in a true bipolar configuration, which are stacked and bonded together, to impart to the device an integral and unitary construction. Each cell (114) includes two electrically conductive electrodes (111A, 111B) that are spaced apart by a predetermined distance. The cell (114) also includes two identical dielectric gaskets (121, 123) that are interposed, in registration with each other, between the electrodes (111A, 111B), for separating and electrically insulating these electrodes. When the electrodes (111A, 111B), and the gaskets (121, 123) are bonded together, at least one fill gap (130) is formed for each cell. Each cell (114) also includes a porous and conductive coating layer (119, 120) that is formed on one surface of each electrode. The coating layer (119) includes a set of closely spaced-apart peripheral microprotrusions (125), and a set of distally spaced-apart central microprotrusions (127). These microprotrusions (125, 127) impart structural support to the cells, and provide additional insulation between the electrodes. An energy storage device (10A) such as a capacitor, is created with the addition of an electrolyte to the gap (130) of the dry preunit (10) and subsequent sealing of the fill ports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 2/08; B05D 1/32; H01G 9/04; H01M 2/16; H01M 2/18; H01M 4/04; H01M 6/12; H01M 6/32; H01M 6/48; H01M 10/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/18 (2006.01); H01G 9/00 (2006.01); H01G 11/04 (2013.01); H01M 2/02 (2006.01); H01M 2/08 (2006.01); H01M 2/16 (2006.01); H01M 4/00 (2006.01); H01M 4/04 (2006.01); H01M 4/58 (2010.01); H01M 6/48 (2006.01); H01M 10/04 (2006.01); H01M 2/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01G 9/155 (2013.01); H01G 11/04 (2013.01); H01M 2/0212 (2013.01); H01M 2/08 (2013.01); H01M 2/1673 (2013.01); H01M 4/00 (2013.01); H01M 4/04 (2013.01); H01M 4/0404 (2013.01); H01M 4/0409 (2013.01); H01M 4/0416 (2013.01); H01M 4/0419 (2013.01); H01M 4/0428 (2013.01); H01M 4/045 (2013.01); H01M 4/0471 (2013.01); H01M 4/58 (2013.01); H01M 6/48 (2013.01); H01M 10/0418 (2013.01); H01M 2/36 (2013.01); H01M 4/0438 (2013.01); Y02E 60/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9407272 A1 19940331; AU 4927793 A 19940412; AU 681351 B2 19970828; CA 2144657 A1 19940331; CN 1096611 A 19941221; CN 1127771 C 20031112; EP 0662248 A1 19950712; EP 0662248 A4 20001025; JP H08501660 A 19960220; NO 951045 A 19950516; NO 951045 D0 19950317; NZ 256329 A 19970526

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050630

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ULTRACAP TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PACIFIC SHINFU TECHNOLOGIES, CO., LTD.

2000-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01M 2/08 A, 7H 01M 2/18 B, 7H 01M 6/12 B, 7H 01M 6/32 B, 7H 01G 9/04 B, 7B 05D 1/32 B, 7H 01M 2/16 B, 7H 01M 4/04 B, 7H 01M 6/48 B, 7H 01M 10/04 B

1995-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950413

1995-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE