Global Patent Index - EP 0662519 B1

EP 0662519 B1 2000-05-31 - Apparatus for heat treating workpieces

Title (en)

Apparatus for heat treating workpieces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement thermique de pièces

Publication

EP 0662519 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94111942 A

Priority

DE 4400326 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0662519A1] Heat treatment furnace, esp. furnace with charge cooling by hydrogen gas circulation for hardening metal parts, includes a liftable hood enclosing the charge heating chamber, a base cover, vacuum and gas inlet and outlet connections, a cooling gas circulating fan and heating elements. A base (7) with charge table (80 is mounted rotatable about a vertical axis (A) in the base cover (3), with heating elements (37,37') on the base (7), a bar grid (33, 34) for holding the charge above the heating elements (37, 37') and an insulating plate (43, 44) below the heating elements (37,37'). A trunnion (15) on the underside of the base (7) projects through the base cover (3) in a sealed bearing (5) and is coupled to a motor drive (19) to rotate the base (7) and charge table (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/773

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/773 (2006.01); C21D 1/613 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/773 (2013.01); C21D 1/613 (2013.01); C21D 9/0037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0662519 A1 19950712; EP 0662519 B1 20000531; DE 4400326 A1 19950713; DE 4400326 C2 20021031; NL 194675 B 20020701; NL 194675 C 20021104; NL 9401597 A 19950801; US 5478057 A 19951226

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409387

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409387 20000706

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-06-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES AG

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990120

1997-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALD VACUUM TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

1997-01-29 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19950712

1995-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950729

1995-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE