EP 0662869 A1 19950719 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE ROTATIONAL SPEED OF THE ROLLS OF A ROLLING MILL.
Title (en)
DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE ROTATIONAL SPEED OF THE ROLLS OF A ROLLING MILL.
Title (de)
VORRICHTUNG ZUM REGELN DER DREHZAHLEN DER WALZEN EINES WALZWERKES.
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION DE LA VITESSE DE ROTATION DES CYLINDRES D'UN LAMINOIR.
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 9300826 W 19930908
- DE 4232685 A 19920929
Abstract (en)
[origin: US5619880A] PCT No. PCT/DE93/00826 Sec. 371 Date Mar. 29, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Mar. 29, 1995 PCT Filed Sep. 8, 1993 PCT Pub. No. WO94/07618 PCT Pub. Date Apr. 14, 1994The rotational speed of the rolls of a rolling mill is controlled such that the loops of rolled material between two roll stands have a constant height. The last roll stand in the direction of rolling preferably acts as a guide roller stand, whose speed is controlled. The loop height is controlled by adjusting the rotational speed of the roll stand ahead of the loop.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/46 (2006.01); B21B 37/48 (2006.01); B21B 37/50 (2006.01); B21B 37/52 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B21B 37/50 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 9407618A1
Citation (examination)
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 228 (M-171)13. November 1982 & JP,A,57
- 130 712 (MITSUBISHI DENKI) 13. August 1982
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT DE IT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
US 5619880 A 19970415; AT E161443 T1 19980115; DE 4232685 A1 19940331; DE 59307903 D1 19980205; EP 0662869 A1 19950719; EP 0662869 B1 19971229; JP H08501501 A 19960220; WO 9407618 A1 19940414
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 40699195 A 19950329; AT 93918963 T 19930908; DE 4232685 A 19920929; DE 59307903 T 19930908; DE 9300826 W 19930908; EP 93918963 A 19930908; JP 50856994 A 19930908