Global Patent Index - EP 0663250 B1

EP 0663250 B1 2001-05-23 - Continuous casting method for steels

Title (en)

Continuous casting method for steels

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Stranggiessen von Stählen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour coulée continue des aciers

Publication

EP 0663250 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95300052 A

Priority

JP 1577294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0663250A1] A continuous casting method which comprises casting molten steel into a cast piece with a circular cross section and applying soft reduction treatment of a reduction ratio from 1.0 to 3.0 % to the cast piece with a flat part of a roll at a position of a solid phase ratio from 0.2 to 0.8 before the molten steel in the center portion of the cast piece is solidified completely. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B22D 11/20 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1206 (2013.01); B21B 1/463 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0663250 A1 19950719; EP 0663250 B1 20010523; DE 69520966 D1 20010628; DE 69520966 T2 20011115; JP 3257224 B2 20020218; JP H07204812 A 19950808

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100105

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100105

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100105

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090102

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20080301

2005-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050105

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520966 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980302

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960112

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT