Global Patent Index - EP 0663360 B1

EP 0663360 B1 2000-04-12 - Sheet transfer cylinder

Title (en)

Sheet transfer cylinder

Title (de)

Bogenführungszylinder

Title (fr)

Cylindres de transfert de feuilles

Publication

EP 0663360 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94120046 A

Priority

DE 4401114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5626075A] Sheet guiding cylinder of a printing press includes a cylinder casing rotatable about an axis of rotation, and having an outer cylindrical surface defining a skeletal framework; the skeletal framework being formed by guide vanes extending in longitudinal direction of the sheet guiding cylinder and having a curved guide vane profile disposed in planes perpendicular to the axis of rotation, the guide vanes beginning from respective locations radially inward from the outer cylindrical surface and terminating substantially radially in an imaginary cylindrical envelope surface enveloping the outer cylindrical surface and being symmetrical with the axis of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/24; B65H 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/245 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5626075 A 19970506; AT 191701 T 20000415; CA 2139084 A1 19950718; EP 0663360 A2 19950719; EP 0663360 A3 19980610; EP 0663360 B1 20000412; JP 3013623 U 19950718

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-01-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030106

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001217

2000-10-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-09-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409290 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191701 T 20000415

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-06-03 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 29/24

1995-10-25 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1995-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941217

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE