Global Patent Index - EP 0663436 B1

EP 0663436 B1 2000-09-06 - Dispersants for lubricating oil

Title (en)

Dispersants for lubricating oil

Title (de)

Dispergiermittel für Schmieröl

Title (fr)

Dispersants pour huile lubrifiante

Publication

EP 0663436 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95300225 A

Priority

US 18304394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0663436A1] Novel dispersant compositions for lubricating oil are described. They exhibit little fluoroelastomer antagonism and are effective in controlling sludge, varnish and wear. The dispersants comprise two components. One is formed by reacting aminoguanidine with a long chain succinic acylating agent. The product may be borated if desired. The other component is formed by reacting (i) a succinic acylating agent and (ii) an alkylene polyamine, and then heating the resultant succinimide concurrently or in any sequence with (iii) a dicarboxylic acylating agent having less than 20 carbon atoms, and (iv) a boron compound to form a product having (1) a total base number of about 33-45 milligrams of KOH per gram of product, excluding weight of any solvent or diluent, and (2) a boron level of about 1.0-1.4 wt% excluding weight of any solvent or diluent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 133/56; C10M 163/00; C10M 167/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10M 133/52 (2006.01); C10M 133/56 (2006.01); C10M 167/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/18 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01); C10N 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 133/52 (2013.01); C10M 133/56 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 159/20 (2013.01); C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 167/00 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/26 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/086 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/10 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/24 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/065 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2229/02 (2013.01); C10M 2229/05 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2210/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/102 (2013.01); C10N 2240/103 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2215/28 + C10M 2215/28

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0663436 A1 19950719; EP 0663436 B1 20000906; AU 1015995 A 19950727; CA 2140168 A1 19950715; CA 2140168 C 20040601; DE 69518673 D1 20001012; DE 69518673 T2 20010523; JP 3920363 B2 20070530; JP H07252492 A 19951003

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2005-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050105

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES LTD

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518673 20001012

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981028

1995-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950825

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT