Global Patent Index - EP 0663463 B1

EP 0663463 B1 2001-05-02 - Device for transporting packages of lap and empty tubes

Title (en)

Device for transporting packages of lap and empty tubes

Title (de)

Transporteinrichtung für Wattewickel und leere Hülsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour transporter enroulements de nappe et bobines vides

Publication

EP 0663463 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95101599 A

Priority

  • EP 89111457 A
  • IT 8343988 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0349852A2] Method to feed packages of lap (13) on textile machines and, in particular, on combing machines (17), a plurality of lap packages (13) being taken simultaneously and automatically in a systematic manner from lap production machines (10) so as to be conveyed automatically to the combing machines (17), where the packages (13) are discharged systematically and automatically at positions suitable to feed the heads of the combing machines (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 27/00; D01G 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/08 (2006.01); D01G 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 27/00 (2013.01); D01G 19/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0349852 A2 19900110; EP 0349852 A3 19900613; EP 0349852 B1 19950830; AT 127172 T 19950915; AT 200918 T 20010515; DE 68924009 D1 19951005; DE 68924009 T2 19960125; DE 68929294 D1 20010607; DE 68929294 T2 20011129; EP 0663463 A1 19950719; EP 0663463 B1 20010502; IT 1225957 B 19901210; IT 8883439 D0 19880705

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2003-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010802

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010623

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68929294 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 349852

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI LU NL SE

2001-05-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200918 T 20010515

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960625

1996-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960625

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950906

1995-07-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 349852

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI LU NL SE