Global Patent Index - EP 0664249 B1

EP 0664249 B1 2000-06-28 - Brake energy balancing system for multiple brake units

Title (en)

Brake energy balancing system for multiple brake units

Title (de)

Bremsenergieausgleichssystem für mehrere Bremseinheiten.

Title (fr)

Système d'équilibrage d'énergie de freins pour plusieurs unités de frein.

Publication

EP 0664249 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94307258 A

Priority

US 15769293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5390990A] The brake energy balancing system balances brake torque of braking wheels of a vehicle having a plurality of cars carried by trucks, for applying and controlling the brakes of each group of braking wheels of the trucks of the vehicle. Brake torque is measured, a command brake torque signal is generated that is limited by a reference torque signal, and the command brake torque signal is compared with the measured brake torque to generate brake torque difference signals. An energy balancing brake application control signal is provided to the brakes in response to the brake torque difference signals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 13/66; B60T 8/00; B60T 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 8/00 (2006.01); B60T 8/17 (2006.01); B60T 8/32 (2006.01); B60T 8/52 (2006.01); B60T 8/88 (2006.01); B60T 17/22 (2006.01); B61H 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 17/221 (2013.01); B60T 8/00 (2013.01); B60T 8/1703 (2013.01); B60T 8/1708 (2013.01); B60T 8/3235 (2013.01); B60T 8/52 (2013.01); B60T 8/885 (2013.01); B60T 2210/13 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5390990 A 19950221; DE 664249 T1 19970213; DE 69425041 D1 20000803; DE 69425041 T2 20001026; EP 0664249 A2 19950726; EP 0664249 A3 19960403; EP 0664249 B1 20000628; HK 1013643 A1 20001027; JP 3321320 B2 20020903; JP H07186919 A 19950725; US 5507568 A 19960416; US 5605387 A 19970225; US 5700072 A 19971223

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141003

2014-10-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141003

2014-10-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69425041

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425041 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970602

1997-02-13 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1996-12-20 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Free text: CORRECTIONS

1996-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960912

1996-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB