Global Patent Index - EP 0664356 B1

EP 0664356 B1 2000-07-05 - Process and apparatus for improving the quality of multi-layer papers

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for improving the quality of multi-layer papers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Papierqualität bei Mehrschicht-und Mehrlagenpapieren

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer la qualité des papiers à plusieurs couches

Publication

EP 0664356 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95100234 A

Priority

DE 4401761 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0664356A2] Improvement of multilayer paper quality in the wet working section of a paper machine entails at least two different quality pulps for paper strip mfr.; collection and recycling of dilute suspension drained from a screen in quite separate containers where at least most of a first pulp is drained through a first screen, corresp. for a second pulp and where the suspensions from each screen are separately gathered and reintroduced to the corresp. pulp i.e. paper layer. The appts. for the implementation comprises: appts. and pipework for gathering the separate dilute suspensions in accordance with quality levels and pipework for the re-introduction of the suspensions. Where a two-layer strip is formed by passing two pulp layers through a continuous double-sided screen, the gathering of the different dilute suspensions is carried out mainly in the screens' initial zone. In the formation of a triple layer sheet where the dilute suspension extracted from a first screen originates essentially from the outer layers it is reintroduced to them, while that from a later screen is reintroduced to the middle layer. The outer layers (S1, S3) can originate from approx. the same pulp and enclose a middle layer (S2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/04; D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/02 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01); D21H 17/63 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 11/04 (2013.01); D21F 9/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0664356 A2 19950726; EP 0664356 A3 19960612; EP 0664356 B1 20000705; AT 194398 T 20000715; CA 2140734 A1 19950723; CA 2140734 C 20060606; DE 4401761 A1 19950727; DE 4401761 C2 19970424; FI 111862 B 20030930; FI 950131 A0 19950111; FI 950131 A 19950723; JP H07300789 A 19951114; US 5639349 A 19970617

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140110

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508521

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194398 T

- Effective date: 20140110

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508521

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-09-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508521 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE SE

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194398 T 20000715

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980914

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961105

1996-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE SE

1995-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE SE