Global Patent Index - EP 0664394 B1

EP 0664394 B1 2000-07-19 - Fluid delivery device with a ceramic internal gear pump

Title (en)

Fluid delivery device with a ceramic internal gear pump

Title (de)

Förderaggregat mit einer keramischen Innenzahnradpumpe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de circulation de fluide avec une pompe à engrenages internes en matière céramique

Publication

EP 0664394 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95100332 A

Priority

DE 4401783 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0664394A1] The delivery unit has an inner pinion causes which an outer pinion via a toothing arranged between the inner pinion and the running ring to rotate with it. The inner pinion has one tooth less than the outer pinion, which causes a pumping effect to occur. At least parts of the inner gearwheel pump, such as the running ring, the inner pinion and outer pinion, are of a ceramic material, which is aluminium oxide or silicon carbide. The surface of the tooth contours of the inner and outer pinions is treated by pressing or injection moulding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/00 (2006.01); F04C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/082 (2013.01); F04C 2230/22 (2013.01); F05C 2203/08 (2013.01); F05C 2203/0817 (2013.01); F05C 2203/0869 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0664394 A1 19950726; EP 0664394 B1 20000719; DE 4401783 A1 19950727; JP H0835490 A 19960206; KR 100385747 B1 20030806; US 5618171 A 19970408

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-01-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508576

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961227

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960111

1995-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT